Global Patent Index - EP 1099624 A2

EP 1099624 A2 2001-05-16 - Ship propulsion with geared single engine

Title (en)

Ship propulsion with geared single engine

Title (de)

Schiffsantrieb mit einem Einmotoren-Getriebe

Title (fr)

Propulsion pour bateau avec moteur engrené

Publication

EP 1099624 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123782 A

Priority

DE 19954691 A

Abstract (en)

The ship's drive has a single motor-gearbox with an axle offset for driving a propeller shaft (7) with a propeller (5) positioned by bearings, whereby the gearbox (2) is rigidly connected to the drive (1), an integral pressure bearing for taking up and transferring propeller thrust and a clutch (3) for connecting or disconnecting the drive. The drive and the gearbox are separately elastically supported on the ship's base plate (6) via an elastic support and via bearings containing elastic elements (13) respectively. The elastic elements are integrated into a separate bearing block rigidly attached to the ship's base and are connected to foot straps laterally formed on the gearbox.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schiffsantrieb ist mit einem Einmotoren-Getriebe mit vertikalem oder horizontalem Achsversatz zum Antreiben einer mit einem Propeller (5) versehenen Propellerwellenleitung (7) ausgerüstet, die durch Traglager (4) positioniert ist. Das Getriebe (2) starr mit dem Antrieb (1) verbunden, weist ein eingebautes Drucklager zur Aufnahme und Übertragung des vom Propeller (5) über die Propellerwellenleitung 7 ausgeübten Schubes auf und ist mit einer Schaltkupplung (3) zum Zu- oder Abschalten des Antriebes (1) verbunden. Der Antrieb (1) ist über elastische Auflager (9) und das Getriebe (2) ist über elastische Elemente (13) enthaltende Lagerungen (24) jeweils separat elastisch auf dem Schiffsfundament (6) gelagert. Die elastische Elemente (13) sind in einem mit dem Schiffsfundament (6) fest verbundenen separaten Lagerbock (14) integriert und mit an dem Getriebe (2) seitlich ausgebildeten Fußpratzen (11) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/30; B63H 23/06; B63H 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/30 (2006.01); B63H 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/305 (2013.01); B63H 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099624 A2 20010516; EP 1099624 A3 20021002; EP 1099624 B1 20040421; AT 264785 T 20040515; DE 19954691 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2011-10-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG#ALFRED-FLENDER-STRASSE 77#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTERLSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2011-09-07 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110826

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081102

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081102

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: A. *FRIEDR. FLENDER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: A. *FRIEDR. FLENDER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-04-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-11-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-08-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006135 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER GMBH

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI