Global Patent Index - EP 1099637 A1

EP 1099637 A1 2001-05-16 - FILAMENT-SHAPED CONNECTION BODY CONNECTION METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (en)

FILAMENT-SHAPED CONNECTION BODY CONNECTION METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KUPPELN BANDFÖRMIGER VERBINDER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION D'UN CORPS DE CONNEXION EN FORME DE FILAMENT

Publication

EP 1099637 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901920 A

Priority

JP 9900396 W

Abstract (en)

A method and device for simple and sure connection of a filament-shaped connecting body, comprising forwardly feeding a collecting body of a multiplicity of filament-shaped connecting bodies L comprising a filament part f, a head h and a joining part k into a join groove 6b and a head groove 6a, which are provided on a side of a body 2, from rearwardly of the body 2, receiving the head h into a head support part 4d of a head conveying arm 4, causing the head h to approach a tip end of a hollow needle 5 along a predetermined path from a position spaced from the hollow needle 5, simultaneously causing a rod 10 of a piston 9 to force the joining part k into the hollow needle 5 to fit the same into a latch hole b of the head h to connect the filament part f in a ring-shaped configuration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 7/00; B65B 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01); B65B 13/18 (2006.01); B65C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/027 (2013.01); B65C 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099637 A1 20010516; EP 1099637 A4 20020403; EP 1099637 B1 20030813; DE 69910401 D1 20030918; DE 69910401 T2 20040701; ES 2200495 T3 20040301; JP 3710123 B2 20051026; WO 0044628 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69910401

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TOSKA CO., LTD.

- Free text: TOSKA CO., LTD.#4-12, IWAMOTO-CHO 3-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 101-0032 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- TOSKA CO., LTD.#4-12, IWAMOTO-CHO 3-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 101-0032 (JP)

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110328

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA;25, AVENUE DU PAILLY;1220 LES AVANCHETS (CH)

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200495 T3

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910401 P 20030918

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-04-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI