Global Patent Index - EP 1099640 A1

EP 1099640 A1 2001-05-16 - Pallet box container for goods

Title (en)

Pallet box container for goods

Title (de)

Palletenbehälter für Waren

Title (fr)

Caisse-palette pour des marchandises

Publication

EP 1099640 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00124531 A

Priority

SE 9904067 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a container for holding goods and being made of cardboard, preferably of corrugated cardboard, said container having two pairs of opposing side walls and a base made up of base flaps connected to the adjoining side walls. The container is adapted to be placed on and combined with a pallet, preferably of cardboard and disposable, said pallet having a deck bearing on a plurality of parallel base girders and being connected with said girders by means of projecting elements arranged on the underside of the deck and perpendicular to said girders. Securing tabs (14) are provided in the box container (2), at least at one pair of the opposing side walls (4,6), said securing tabs (14) being adapted to secure and lock the box container (2) to the pallet (30) by abutting the underside of the deck between adjacent projecting elements (36) and by being inserted between the deck and the nearest base girder (34), such that the securing tab secures and lock the box container (2) to the pallet (30) when goods are loaded in the container (2). The invention also relates to a method to secure a pallet box container for holding goods on a pallet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/20 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00019 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00054 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00159 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00333 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00497 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00567 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00641 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00661 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

SE 503535 C2 19960701 - STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AB [SE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099640 A1 20010516; SE 9904067 D0 19991110; SE 9904067 L 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI