Global Patent Index - EP 1099644 A1

EP 1099644 A1 2001-05-16 - Container closure

Title (en)

Container closure

Title (de)

Verschluss für Behälter

Title (fr)

Fermeture pour récipient

Publication

EP 1099644 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124522 A

Priority

  • DE 19953846 A
  • DE 10000335 A
  • DE 10027180 A

Abstract (en)

The closure for a drinks can contains an insert (12) with a ventilation orifice (44). During transport this is closed by a locking component (46). A ventilation component (14) has a section (90) which ruptures the locking component when it is raised above the insert.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Verschluß für Behälter, insbesondere Getränkebehälter, für in einem Behälterinnern angeordnete und unter Druck stehende Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere Getränke, umfassend ein in einen Deckel des Behälter einsetzbares Einsatzteil (12), welches eine Belüftungsöffnung (44) aufweist, ein von einem Transportzustand, in welchem der Verschluß den Behälter verschlossen hält, in einen Zapfzustand, in welchem der Verschluß für einen Strom eines Mediums durchgängig ist, relativ zum Einsatzteil (12) bewegbares und von außerhalb des Behälters zugängliches Belüftungsteil (14), derart zu verbessern, daß dieser im Transportzustand zuverlässiger den Behälter verschließt, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Belüftungsöffnung (44) in dem Transportzustand mittels eines dicht an dem Einsatzteil fixierten Verschlußteils (46) verschlossen ist, daß das Belüftungsteil (14) ein Öffnungselement (90) zum Zerstören des Verschlußteils aufweist, daß das Öffnungselement (90) in dem Transportzustand in einer inaktiven, das Verschlußteil (46) nicht beaufschlagenden Stellung steht und daß das Öffnungselement (90) zum Erreichen des Zapfzustandes durch Bewegen des Belüftungsteils (14) gegenüber dem Einsatzteil (12) in eine aktive, das Verschlußteil (46) zerstörende Stellung bringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/1677 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099644 A1 20010516; EP 1099644 B1 20040526

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006581

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-11-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006581 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JULIUS KLEEMANN GMBH & CO.

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI