Global Patent Index - EP 1099645 A1

EP 1099645 A1 2001-05-16 - Package with cleanliness and safety device

Title (en)

Package with cleanliness and safety device

Title (de)

Verpackung mit Sauberkeits- und Sichereitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Emballage avec dispositif de propreté et de sécurité

Publication

EP 1099645 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99490035 A

Priority

EP 99490035 A

Abstract (en)

The pack (1) has a uni- or multi-layer structure (5) forming a hermetically sealed wall bounded by a welded bead (6) and forming a container (7) for the product. A pre-cut line (9) allows a tear-off strip to be removed to open the container, and peel-back layers (10) then leave a clean zone (11) which makes contact with the lips when the product is consumed.

Abstract (fr)

Emballage (1) pour le conditionnement de produits (2) liquides, semi-pâteux ou solides à faible granulométrie tels que yaourts, glaces, sauces, confiseries en poudre et médicaments destinés à être consommés en portant une partie (3) de l'emballage directement au contact des lèvres, ledit emballage comprend: une structure (5) monocouche ou multicouches qui constitue une paroi hermétique de l'emballage (1) délimitée par un cordon (6) de soudure qui scelle ledit emballage et définit un conteneur (7) renfermant le produit, des moyens de prédécoupe (9) qui permettent la séparation d'une zone détachable (8) de l'emballage et ouvre le conteneur (7) pour donner accès au produit (2) liquide, semi-pâteux ou solides à faible granulométrie. et est caractérisé par le fait qu'il dispose des moyens (10) protecteurs pour libérer une zone propre (11) sur la structure de l'emballage correspondant à la partie de l'emballage qui entre, en contact avec les lèvres de l'utilisateur au moment de la consommation du produit contenu à l'intérieur, afin d'assurer les règles d'hygiène strictes et d'éviter ainsi que le consommateur ne porte à sa bouche un emballage souillé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/52; B65D 75/38; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/38 (2006.01); B65D 75/52 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5805 (2013.01); B65D 75/38 (2013.01); B65D 75/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099645 A1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040601

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI