Global Patent Index - EP 1099650 A1

EP 1099650 A1 2001-05-16 - Manhole cover plate for an enamelled temperature and corrosion resistant reactor vessel

Title (en)

Manhole cover plate for an enamelled temperature and corrosion resistant reactor vessel

Title (de)

Verschlussdeckel, insbesondere Mannlochdeckel, für einen temperatur- und korossionsbeständig emaillierten Reaktionsbehälter

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour trou d'homme d'une cuve du réacteur émaillée résistant à la corrosion et aux températures élevées

Publication

EP 1099650 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122341 A

Priority

EP 99122341 A

Abstract (en)

The enamelled reactor has a sight glass (113) whose outer circumference is fused to the enamel layer on the inner circumference of an orifice in the reactor wall (101). A concentric groove (115) on the inside (101b) or outside of the container wall around the glass prevents stress on it.

Abstract (de)

Verschlußdeckel, insbesondere Mannlochdeckel (1), für einen emaillierten Reaktionsbehälter mit einem Schauglas (13), welches entlang seinem Außenumfang über eine auf dem Innenumfang einer Verschlußdeckelöffnung (7) aufgebrachte Emailschicht mit dem Verschlußdeckel fluiddicht verschmolzen ist, wobei der Verschlußdeckel derart ausgebildet und/oder das Schauglas derart in diesem angeordnet ist, daß dessen Umfang im wesentlichen frei von insbesondere im Bereich der Oberseite des Verschlußdeckels auftretenden Zugspannungen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099650 A1 20010516; EP 1099650 B1 20050126; DE 59911527 D1 20050303

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: PFAUDLER GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PFAUDLER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PFAUDLER WERKE GMBH, DE

2016-10-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PFAUDLER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PFAUDLER WERKE GMBH, 68723 SCHWETZINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59911527

2016-10-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911527

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PFAUDLER WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911527 P 20050303

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2005-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REINEMUTH, JUERGEN, DR. ING.

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THEILIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.(FH)

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEINZMANN, MATHIAS, DIPL. ING.(FH)

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REINEMUTH, JUERGEN, DR. ING.

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THELLIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.(FH)

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEINZMANN, MATHIAS, DIPL. ING.(FH)

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2002-02-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20011116

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI