Global Patent Index - EP 1099655 A2

EP 1099655 A2 2001-05-16 - Device and method for guiding a laterally stable web

Title (en)

Device and method for guiding a laterally stable web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Führen einer querstabilen Warenbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour guider une bande latéralement stable

Publication

EP 1099655 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121212 A

Priority

  • DE 19954654 A
  • DE 10001816 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has several rollers that can be pressed against the material, are independently rotated, can be placed on the material approximately centrally, can be displaced transversely to the direction of material motion, are pivotably mounted and are opposite a support consisting of pivotably mounted counter rollers movable transversely to the strip movement direction. The material is clamped between the rollers and counter rollers. The arrangement has several axially aligned rollers (3) that can be pressed against the material (2), are independently rotated, can be placed on the material approximately centrally, can be displaced transversely to the direction of motion of the strip material, are pivotably mounted and are opposite a support (13) for the material strip consisting of several pivotably mounted counter rollers (4) movable transversely to the strip movement direction (7). The material strip is clamped between the rollers and counter rollers. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of transporting a transversely stable material strip.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Führen einer querstabilen Warenbahn (2) weist mindestens eine Rolle (3) und eine der Warenbahn (2) gegenüberliegende Gegenrolle (4) auf. Die Rolle (3) und Gegenrolle (4) sind synchron zueinander verschwenkbar und halten die Warenbahn (2) zwischen sich im Klemmgriff. Mit dieser Vorrichtung (1) lassen sich wesentlich höhere quer zur Bahnlaufrichtung (7) gerichtete Führungskräfte einbringen als mit stationären Widerlagern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/038 (2006.01); B65H 23/26 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B65H 23/038 (2013.01); B65H 23/26 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4189 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44318 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1122 (2013.01); B65H 2404/133 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1421 (2013.01); B65H 2404/14212 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1442 (2013.01); B65H 2553/42 (2013.01); B65H 2555/10 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1762 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099655 A2 20010516; EP 1099655 A3 20030319; EP 1099655 B1 20051221; AT 313508 T 20060115; AT 458687 T 20100315; CA 2325323 A1 20010513; CA 2325323 C 20050614; DE 10001816 C1 20010621; DE 50011901 D1 20060126; DE 50015875 D1 20100408; EP 1650150 A2 20060426; EP 1650150 A3 20060503; EP 1650150 B1 20100224; ES 2254094 T3 20060616; JP 2001163492 A 20010619; JP 3442735 B2 20030902; US 6450381 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060929

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ERHARDT + LEIMER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060929

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254094 T3

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-05-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-03-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-03-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011901 P 20060126

2006-01-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-06-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A LATERALLY STABLE WEB

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 23/02 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 23/038 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI