Global Patent Index - EP 1099660 A1

EP 1099660 A1 2001-05-16 - Apparatus for opening swing-stopper bottles

Title (en)

Apparatus for opening swing-stopper bottles

Title (de)

Maschine zum Öffnen von Bügelverschlussflaschen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour ouvrir des bouteilles avec une fermeture à étrier

Publication

EP 1099660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124518 A

Priority

DE 19953916 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a rotary table (1) after an input star (2) and before an output star (3), each with peripheral bottle holding points and coupled for transporting bottles (5). Each rotary table bottle holding point has an opening element. A rotary alignment system (6) is arranged in the input star so bottles are transferred to the table holding points in a position in which the clamp yoke lies on the side of the bottle facing away from the table.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Maschine von unsortiert verschlossenen und nicht verschlossenen Bügelverschlußflaschen. Sie besteht im wesentlichen aus einem Drehtisch (1), einem dem Drehtisch (1) vorgeordneten Einlaufstern (2) und einem dem Drehtisch nachgeordneten Auslaufstern (3). Im Einlaufstern (2) werden nur die verschlossen ankommenden Bügelverschlußflaschen (5) mit einem Ausrichtsystem (6) in ihrer Drehstellung derart ausgerichtet, daß sie mit auf der dem Drehtisch (1) abgewandten Seite der Bügelverschlußflasche (5) liegendem Spannbügel in den Drehtisch (1) gelangen. Im Einlaufstern (2) wird mittels eines die Bügelverschlußflaschen (5) auf "verschlossen" oder "nicht verschlossen" überprüfenden Fühlersystems (17) der Zustand der Bügelverschlußflaschen (5) festgestellt. In Abhängigkeit von dem Prüfergebnis werden im Drehtisch (1) jedem Aufnahmeplatz (la) zugeordnete Öffnungselemente für die einzelnen Bügelverschlußflaschen (5) nur aktiviert, wenn das Fühlersystem (17) das Prüfergebnis "verschlossen" für die betreffende Bügelverschlußflasche (5) gemeldet hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3432947 C2 19870212

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099660 A1 20010516; EP 1099660 B1 20040721; AT 271519 T 20040815

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111109

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 271519 T

- Effective date: 20111109

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007120

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007120 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2004-07-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT NL

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI