Global patent index - EP 1099672 A2

EP 1099672 A2 2001-05-16 - Ceramic-molding binder

Title (en)

Ceramic-molding binder

Title (de)

Bindemittel für keramische Formkörper

Title (fr)

Liant pour des articles moulés en céramique

Publication

EP 1099672 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123866 A

Priority

  • JP 32093699 A
  • JP 2000169122 A

Abstract (en)

A ceramic-molding binder includes a vinyl alcohol polymer having an ethylene unit content of 2 to 19 mole %, a polymerization degree of 200 to 2,000, a degree of saponification of 80 to 99.99 mole %, and a carboxylic acid and lactone ring content of 0.02 to 0.4 mole %. The use of the ceramic-molding binder provides green moldings with better formability and handling properties during the formation of smaller green moldings of more complex shape, and also provides ceramic products of good quality, higher yields, and fewer ceramic cracks when obtained by sintering such green moldings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/634; C04B 35/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 131/04 (2006.01); C04B 35/26 (2006.01); C04B 35/632 (2006.01); C04B 35/634 (2006.01); C08F 8/12 (2006.01); C08F 216/06 (2006.01); C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08L 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/63416 (2013.01); C04B 35/26 (2013.01); C04B 35/634 (2013.01); Y02P 30/48 (2015.11)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099672 A2 20010516; EP 1099672 A3 20020410; EP 1099672 B1 20050720; CN 1157455 C 20040714; CN 1296051 A 20010523; DE 60021337 D1 20050825; DE 60021337 T2 20060524; HU 0004291 A2 20011228; HU 0004291 A3 20030228; HU 0004291 D0 20010129; JP 2001199772 A 20010724; JP 4864190 B2 20120201; KR 100714138 B1 20070502; KR 20010051587 A 20010625; MX PA00011073 A 20020523; US 6737013 B1 20040518

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60021337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 04B 35/634 A, 7C 04B 35/26 B, 7C 08K 3/22 B, 7C 08F 8/16 B, 7C 08F 8/12 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI