Global Patent Index - EP 1099722 A2

EP 1099722 A2 2001-05-16 - Plastic article having a metallic appearance, particularly radio wristwatch housings

Title (en)

Plastic article having a metallic appearance, particularly radio wristwatch housings

Title (de)

Metallisch erscheinender Kunststoff-Artikel, insbesondere Funkarmbanduhrgehäuse

Title (fr)

Article en matière plastique ayant un aspect métallique, en particulier boitiers de montre bracelet radio

Publication

EP 1099722 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124490 A

Priority

DE 19954553 A

Abstract (en)

A plastic article (I) having a metallic appearance, preferably a radio/wrist watch casing is characterized by coating the plastic article with a hard lacquer to achieve an optical and mechanical improvement.

Abstract (de)

Durch Applikation von modernen Lacken auf den Kunststoffrohling wird dessen farbdekorierte Oberfläche wesentlich besser geschützt, als bei Anwendung bisher üblicher Farblacke. Das Aushärten erfolgt vorwiegend herkömmlich thermisch, aber auch die zukunftsträchtige Lichtaushärtung vor UV-Lampen ist anwendbar, für die nur noch etwa ein Zehntel der Energie benötigt wird, die für thermisches Aushärten einzusetzen ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 7/04; C09D 5/38; G04B 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/06 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B05D 7/02 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01); C08J 7/04 (2006.01); G04B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 7/047 (2013.01); G04B 37/226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099722 A2 20010516; EP 1099722 A3 20010816; CN 1301603 A 20010704; DE 19954553 A1 20010613; JP 2001164010 A 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI