Global Patent Index - EP 1099743 A1

EP 1099743 A1 2001-05-16 - Photochromic plastic article

Title (en)

Photochromic plastic article

Title (de)

Photochromer Kunststoffgegenstand

Title (fr)

Article en plastique photochromique

Publication

EP 1099743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124278 A

Priority

DE 19954525 A

Abstract (en)

Photochromic polymer article comprises a transparent polymer containing a photochromic dye(s) with its reactive center covered with a supramolecular protective shell.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen photochromen Kunststoffgegenstand, der ein transparentes Kunststoffmaterial und darin eingebracht mindestens einen photochromen Farbstoff umfasst, wobei mindestens das photochrome Reaktionszentrum des photochromen Farbstoffs von einer Schutzhülle auf Basis einer supramolekularen Struktur umgeben ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 2677366 A1 19921211 - PROLABO SA [FR]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 380 (P - 528) 19 December 1986 (1986-12-19)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 250 (P - 491) 28 August 1986 (1986-08-28)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198850, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A89, AN 1988-357727, XP002160266
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 015 (C - 559) 13 January 1989 (1989-01-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099743 A1 20010516; EP 1099743 B1 20041110

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081113

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071107

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071008

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-05-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-01-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008588 P 20041216

2004-12-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-12-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RODENSTOCK GMBH

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RODENSTOCK GMBH

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI