Global Patent Index - EP 1099747 A2

EP 1099747 A2 2001-05-16 - Process and plant handling nitrogen containing organic compounds by gasification

Title (en)

Process and plant handling nitrogen containing organic compounds by gasification

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwertung stickstofforganischer Verbindungen durch Vergasung

Title (fr)

Procédé et insatallation pour le traitement de produits organiques contenant de l' azote par gazification

Publication

EP 1099747 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124099 A

Priority

DE 19954188 A

Abstract (en)

Process for evaluating a material consisting of organonitrogen compounds comprises carrying out gasification under normal or elevated pressure, preferably up to 40 bar at temperatures more than 900, preferably 1100-1600 degrees C as partial oxidation using a gasifying agent containing free oxygen. The gasification occurs as a flame reaction in a fly stream gasifier. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for carrying out the process comprising a feed (1) connected to a fly stream gasifier (2) with a quencher (3); an effluent preparation unit (12) connected to the quencher via a pipeline; a high pressure steam generator (4) connected to a fly stream gasifier, the hot gas being introduced to a COS/HCN hydrolysis unit (6) after a hot gas filter (5); a low pressure steam generator (7) with a condenser (8); a desulfurization unit (9) which produces pure gas (10) and sulfur (11); and a pipeline (13) between the effluent preparation unit and fly stream gasifier to supply ammonia to the effluent preparation unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Verwertung eines im Wesentlichen aus stickstofforganischen Verbindungen bestehenden Einsatzstoffes, bei dem die Verwertung durch Vergasung unter Normaldruck oder erhöhtem Druck, vorzugsweise bis 40 bar, bei Temperaturen > 900 °C, vorzugsweise zwischen 1 100 - 1 600 °C, als Partialoxidation unter Verwendung eines freien Sauerstoff enthaltenden Vergasungsmittels erfolgt und eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/46; C10J 3/48; C10J 3/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/466 (2013.01); C10J 3/485 (2013.01); C10J 3/84 (2013.01); C10K 1/004 (2013.01); C10K 1/006 (2013.01); C10K 1/024 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1687 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1807 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099747 A2 20010516; EP 1099747 A3 20031112; BR 0005316 A 20010703; DE 19954188 A1 20010531; US 6808653 B1 20041026

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2008-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUTURE ENERGY GMBH

2004-09-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10J 3/46 A

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10J 3/48 B

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10J 3/86 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI