Global Patent Index - EP 1099748 A2

EP 1099748 A2 2001-05-16 - Surfactant containing detergent compositions

Title (en)

Surfactant containing detergent compositions

Title (de)

Tensid-haltige Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Compositions détèrgentes contenant des tensioactifs

Publication

EP 1099748 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124048 A

Priority

DE 19954831 A

Abstract (en)

Solid or liquid to gel-type laundry and other detergents, containing surfactants and other detergent constituents. Solid or liquid to gel-type laundry and other detergents, containing surfactants and other detergent constituents, contain surfactant(s) from the group of di-, tri- and polycarboxylic esters with alkoxylated 8-22 carbon (C) alcohols.

Abstract (de)

Es werden feste oder flüssige bis gelförmige Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel beansprucht, die Tenside und sonstige Waschmittelbestandteile enthalten und dadurch gekennzeichnet sind, daß mindestens ein Tensid aus der Gruppe von Di-, Tri- und Polycarbonsäureestern mit alkoxylierten C8-22-Alkoholen enthalten ist. Die Mittel zeichnen sich durch eine verbesserte Löslichkeit aus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/003 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099748 A2 20010516; EP 1099748 A3 20020529; DE 19954831 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 11/00 A, 7C 11D 1/83 B, 7C 11D 1/74 B

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI