Global Patent Index - EP 1099751 A2

EP 1099751 A2 2001-05-16 - Disposal means

Title (en)

Disposal means

Title (de)

Wegwerfmittel

Title (fr)

Moyens de rebut

Publication

EP 1099751 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308998 A

Priority

GB 9925829 A

Abstract (en)

An alkali-disposable ostomy bag 20 is disposed of in a wc 14 using a tablet 1 having inner and outer portions. The inner portion 10 is of an alkai and this is covered by the outer portion 11, which is a non-irritating mixture of a water-softening agent and a surfactant. The tablet 1 can be handled safely by the user because the alkali 10 is covered by the outer portion 11. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/04; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/00 (2006.01); A61G 12/00 (2006.01); B09B 3/00 (2006.01); B09C 1/02 (2006.01); B09C 1/08 (2006.01); C02F 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0052 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099751 A2 20010516; EP 1099751 A3 20010801; GB 0024953 D0 20001129; GB 2357295 A 20010620; GB 9925829 D0 19991229; JP 2001191064 A 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MENTOR MEDICAL LIMITED

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHS GROUP PLC

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI