Global Patent Index - EP 1099758 A2

EP 1099758 A2 2001-05-16 - Method and host cells for producing two-chain relaxin polypeptide

Title (en)

Method and host cells for producing two-chain relaxin polypeptide

Title (de)

Verfahren und Gastzellen zur Herstellung von Zweikettigen Relaxin-Polypeptide

Title (fr)

Méthode et cellules hôtes pour la production de polypeptides de relaxine bicaténaires

Publication

EP 1099758 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01103965 A

Priority

  • EP 93900978 A
  • US 80363191 A
  • US 88726592 A

Abstract (en)

A Chinese hamster ovary (CHO) host cell or a human embryonic kidney (HEK) host cell that comprises a first nucleic acid encoding a prorelaxin polypeptide and a second nucleic acid encoding an enzyme that is capable of cleaving the prorelaxin polypeptide to form a mature, two-chain relaxin polypeptide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/16; C07K 14/64; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/48 (2006.01); C07K 14/485 (2006.01); C07K 14/49 (2006.01); C07K 14/495 (2006.01); C07K 14/50 (2006.01); C07K 14/515 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/525 (2006.01); C07K 14/53 (2006.01); C07K 14/54 (2006.01); C07K 14/555 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 14/58 (2006.01); C07K 14/59 (2006.01); C07K 14/61 (2006.01); C07K 14/62 (2006.01); C07K 14/64 (2006.01); C07K 14/65 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/17 (2006.01); C12N 15/57 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6424 (2013.01); C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 14/48 (2013.01); C07K 14/62 (2013.01); C07K 14/64 (2013.01); C12N 9/6454 (2013.01); C12N 15/62 (2013.01); C12N 15/85 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01); C07K 2319/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9311247 A1 19930610; AT 204606 T 20010915; CA 2123430 A1 19930610; CA 2123430 C 20040210; DE 69232017 D1 20010927; DE 69232017 T2 20020321; DK 0616645 T3 20011008; EP 0616645 A1 19940928; EP 0616645 B1 20010822; EP 1099758 A2 20010516; EP 1099758 A3 20010523; ES 2160591 T3 20011116; JP H07501703 A 19950223; PT 616645 E 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070130

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060918

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-05-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 616645

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE