Global Patent Index - EP 1099769 A1

EP 1099769 A1 2001-05-16 - Process for manufacturing high tensile strength hot rolled steel sheet for forming and especially for deep drawing

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing high tensile strength hot rolled steel sheet for forming and especially for deep drawing

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von warmgewalztem, hochfestem Stahlblech zur Umformung und insbesondere zum Tiefziehen

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une bande de tôle laminée à chaud à très haute résistance, utilisable pour la mise en forme et notamment pour l'emboutissage

Publication

EP 1099769 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402987 A

Priority

FR 9914187 A

Abstract (en)

Producing a hot rolled steel sheet includes forming the sheet 880 degrees C, initially cooling for 10 s, further cooling at 20-150 degrees C/sec to 700-750 degrees C, further cooling at 3-20 degrees C/sec, depending on the sheet thickness, to 640-700 degrees C and then controlled cooling at 20-150 degrees C/sec to 350-550 degrees C. The steel comprises 0.12-0.25% C, 1-2 % Mn, 0.03-2.5% Al, 0.04-2% Cr, 0.02-0.09 % P and 0.01% S. An Independent claim is included for a hot rolled steel sheet produced as above. Preferred Features: The steel may also include 0.15 % titanium, 0.15% Nb and 0.15% V.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une bande de tôle laminée à chaud à très haute résistance, utilisable pour la mise en forme et notamment pour l'emboutissage, caractérisé en ce que l'acier de composition pondérale suivante : 0,12% <= carbone <= 0,25% ; 1% <= manganèse <= 2% ; 0,03% <= aluminium <= 2,5% ; 0,03% <= silicium <= 2% ; 0,04% <= chrome <= 2% ; 0,02% <= phosphore <= 0,09% ; soufre <= 0,01%, et de manière optionnelle ; titane <= 0,15% ; niobium <= 0,15% ; vanadium <= 0,15% ; est soumis à : un laminage à une température inférieure à 880°C, un premier refroidissement court, effectué dans un temps inférieur à 10 secondes, un deuxième refroidissement contrôlé avec une vitesse de refroidissement V ref1 comprise entre 20°C/ seconde et 150°C/seconde, la température de la fin du deuxième refroidissement étant comprise entre 700°C à 750°C, un maintien sur un palier de température, un troisième refroidissement également contrôlé dont la vitesse est comprise entre 20°C/seconde et 150°C/seconde, la température de la fin du troisième refroidissement étant comprise entre 350°C et 550°C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/02; C22C 38/38; C22C 38/02; C22C 38/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0426 (2013.01); C21D 8/0463 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099769 A1 20010516; EP 1099769 B1 20040317; AT 262046 T 20040415; BR 0005331 A 20010703; CA 2325892 A1 20010512; CA 2325892 C 20090922; DE 60009002 D1 20040422; DE 60009002 T2 20050303; ES 2216840 T3 20041101; FR 2801061 A1 20010518; FR 2801061 B1 20011214; PT 1099769 E 20040630; US 2003084973 A1 20030508; US 6475308 B1 20021105; US 6797078 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040401887

- Effective date: 20130508

2012-10-23 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2012-09-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 262046 T

- Effective date: 20111129

2012-08-21 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2012-06-14 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60009002

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040317

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040317

2012-04-27 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-04-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20111129

2012-04-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20111129

2012-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-29 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60009002

2011-11-29 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60009002

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG

2010-01-04 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

2009-12-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG

- Effective date: 20041217

2009-10-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Effective date: 20041217

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

2006-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216840 T3

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401887

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009002 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: USINOR

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI