Global Patent Index - EP 1099784 A1

EP 1099784 A1 2001-05-16 - Weaving machine with a device for inserting a plurality of generally different weft threads

Title (en)

Weaving machine with a device for inserting a plurality of generally different weft threads

Title (de)

Webmaschine mit einem Eintragungssystem für eine Mehrzahl von in der Regel unterschiedlicher Schussfäden

Title (fr)

Métier à tisser avec système d'insertion pour une pluralité de fils de trame en règle générale différents

Publication

EP 1099784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810756 A

Priority

  • EP 00810756 A
  • EP 99810853 A

Abstract (en)

The system includes a rapier (10) for supplying wefts (1) from thread housings (3) in the thread replenishment section selectively to the color selection portion (4). At least one common brake for all wefts (1) pass between the guide roll (6) and thread monitor (9).

Abstract (de)

Die Webmaschine enthält ein Eintragungssystem für eine Mehrzahl von in der Regel unterschiedlichen Schussfäden, welches für jeden Schussfaden einen Fadenvorrat (2), einen Fadenspeicher (3) und einen Farbwähler (4) zum wahlweisen Vorlegen der Schussfäden sowie einen Greifer (10) zum Eintragen des vorgelegten Schussfadens umfasst. Es ist mindestens eine für sämtliche Schussfäden gemeinsame Fadenbremse (7) vorgesehen, um den jeweils vorgelegten Schussfaden (1) während der Eintragung bedarfsweise zu bremsen. Neben dem einfachen mechanischen Aufbau wird die einfache Handhabung und Steuerung als Vorteil angesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; D03D 47/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); D03D 47/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0461524 A1 19911218 - VAMATEX SPA [IT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099784 A1 20010516; EP 1099784 B1 20091111

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015789

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100824

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ITEMA (SWITZERLAND) LTD.

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100812

2009-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015789 P 20091224

2009-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2009-10-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITEMA (SWITZERLAND) LTD.

2008-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080813

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI