Global Patent Index - EP 1099791 A1

EP 1099791 A1 2001-05-16 - Composition and method for cleaning leather

Title (en)

Composition and method for cleaning leather

Title (de)

Mittel sowie Verfahren zum Reinigen von Leder

Title (fr)

Composition et procédé pour nettoyer le cuir

Publication

EP 1099791 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124172 A

Priority

DE 19954468 A

Abstract (en)

Environmentally friendly cleaner for leather (products) comprises a solution of water and a washing agent and an unsulfonated, water-insoluble oil or fat and is of pH 3.5-6.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mittel zum Reinigen von Leder oder Lederprodukten, besteht aus einer Lösung, die Wasser und wenigstens eine Waschsubstanz sowie einen Anteil an einem unsulfonierten, wasserunlöslichen Öl oder Fett in Emulsion enthält. Die PH-Wert der Lösung ist auf einen Bereich zwischen 3,5-6 eingestellt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06L 1/12; C11D 3/46; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2093 (2013.01); C11D 3/0031 (2013.01); C11D 3/2075 (2013.01); C11D 17/0017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099791 A1 20010516; EP 1099791 B1 20051012; AT 306579 T 20051015; DE 19954468 A1 20010607; DE 50011323 D1 20060223

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071108

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060309

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061108

2006-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061108

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011323 P 20060223

2006-01-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OLLERT, HERMANN ANDREAS

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OLLERT, UWE

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI