Global Patent Index - EP 1099804 A1

EP 1099804 A1 2001-05-16 - Vacuum toilet

Title (en)

Vacuum toilet

Title (de)

Vakuumtoilette

Title (fr)

Toilette à vide

Publication

EP 1099804 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122519 A

Priority

EP 99122519 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum toilet comprises a basin (1), into which issues a vacuum pipe conduit (3). In the area of the conduit mouth (2) is a cross-sectional narrowed formation formed as a foreign body stop (5) extending radially into the conduit interior. Alternatively, an insert pipe part is provided, insertable in the vacuum pipe conduit and provided with a foreign body stop.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vakuumtoilette umfaßt ein Toilettenbecken (1) und eine in dieses Toilettenbecken mündende Vakuumrohrleitung (3). Im Bereich der Mündung (2) weist die Vakuumleitung (3) eine Querschnittsverengung in Form einer radial in das Leitungsinnere ragenden Fremdkörpersperre (5) auf. Alternativ ist ein Einsatzrohrteil (6) vorgesehen, welches in die Vakuumrohrleitung (3) im Bereich der Mündung (2) einsetzbar ist und eine oben beschriebene Fremdkörpersperre (5) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/18 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/006 (2013.01); E03D 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099804 A1 20010516; US 6668389 B1 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040720

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI