Global Patent Index - EP 1099805 A1

EP 1099805 A1 2001-05-16 - Structural support

Title (en)

Structural support

Title (de)

Tragkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Support de structure

Publication

EP 1099805 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00309896 A

Priority

GB 9926415 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and a method for supporting a structural support assembly, for supporting an existing roof structure, from an existing I-beam of the roof structure. The apparatus comprises a first clamp (21) having a first jaw member (22) arranged to engage one face of the web (12) of the I-beam (11), a second jaw member (23) arranged to engage the opposite face of the web (12) of the I-beam, and, securing means (24) joining the first and second jaw members (22,23) and extending, in use, through an existing aperture (13) in the web of the I-beam, the jaw members (22,23) being shaped to span said aperture (13) of the web (12) of the I-beam (11), a second similar clamp (21a) the securing means of which extends through the same, or an adjacent, aperture of the I-beam, and an elongate angle member (25) extending parallel to the I-beam and secured to the first jaws (22) of the first and second clamps (21,21a) such that one limb (25a) of the angle member (25) is substantially horizontal in use so as to be able to form a support ledge for one end of a subsidiary, roof supporting beam of the structural support assembly in use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04B 5/14; E04B 7/00; E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/14 (2006.01); E04B 7/00 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01); E04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01); E04B 5/14 (2013.01); E04B 7/00 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2448 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099805 A1 20010516; EP 1099805 B1 20040609; GB 9926415 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121107

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-07-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120621 AND 20120627

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101103

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI