Global Patent Index - EP 1099810 A1

EP 1099810 A1 2001-05-16 - Actuating device for a locking mechanism of a vehicle door

Title (en)

Actuating device for a locking mechanism of a vehicle door

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für einen Verriegelungsmechanismus einer Fahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'un mécanisme de verrouillage d'une porte d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1099810 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403132 A

Priority

FR 9914324 A

Abstract (en)

The door handle (12a) is coupled with a command mechanism (13) comprising a guiding track (19) integral with the door and a sliding organ (14) integral with the handle. The sliding organ is controlled by a motor (26) via a clutch assembly. The door handle (12a) can be aligned with the door wall (11b) so that an user can not grip. The second position is when the handle is prominent and a third when the handle is placed more distant from the door wall than in the position of use.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de commande d'un mécanisme de verrouillage d'une porte d'un véhicule pratique, sûr et perfectionné, ne nécessitant pas une zone d'accès permanente à l'organe d'actionnement manuel, et permettant d'améliorer l'esthétique et l'aérodynamisme de la porte. Ce dispositif de commande (100) est caractérisé en ce que ledit organe d'actionnement manuel (12) comporte une poignée (12a) mobile entre une position de repos, dans laquelle un utilisateur ne peut pas saisir la poignée, et une position d'utilisation, dans laquelle un utilisateur peut saisir la poignée pour l'amener dans une position actionnée permettant de déverrouiller la porte. La poignée (12a) comporte une tige (12b) montée coulissante dans un support de transmission (14), lui-même monté coulissant dans un rail de guidage (19) fixe. Ce support (14) est commandé en déplacement par une crémaillère (16), un train d'engrenage (20) et un moteur (26). Le dispositif de commande (100) comporte un bouton poussoir (29) actionnable par l'utilisateur, superposé à la poignée (12a) et coopérant avec un interrupteur (31) pour transmettre au moteur (26) un signal électrique de demande d'utilisation de la poignée (12a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 5/00; E05B 17/22; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/107 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099810 A1 20010516; FR 2800784 A1 20010511; FR 2800784 B1 20080215

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MGI COUTIER

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI