Global Patent Index - EP 1099816 A1

EP 1099816 A1 2001-05-16 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1099816 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00124655 A

Priority

IT TO990976 A

Abstract (en)

A handle (1) for a vehicle door (2) has a supporting structure (10) fittable to the door (2), and a control lever (15) having an elongated grip portion (16) and which is movable, with respect to the supporting structure (10), between a rest position and a control position controlling a lock on the door (2); the control lever (15) is connected to the supporting structure (10) by a guide and slide assembly (37) to enable the grip portion (16) to move between the rest position and the control position along a conical surface (S) having a generating line (D) substantially parallel to the elongated grip portion (16). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099816 A1 20010516; IT 1311350 B1 20020312; IT TO990976 A1 20010514; IT TO990976 D0 19991112

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030209

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI