Global Patent Index - EP 1099817 A1

EP 1099817 A1 2001-05-16 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1099817 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00124657 A

Priority

IT TO990979 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle door handle (1) has a connecting body (2) having a seat (8) extending along an axis (A); a lock assembly (3) insertable inside the seat (8) in a direction (D) parallel to the axis (A), and having at least one tooth (19) extending crosswise to the aforementioned direction (D); and a ring nut (20), which has a stop wall extending inside the seat (8), and rotates about the axis (A) between a first position permitting insertion of the lock assembly (3) and the tooth (19), and a second position wherein the stop wall clamps the tooth (19) in the aforementioned direction (D). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 9/084 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099817 A1 20010516; EP 1099817 B1 20040811; DE 60012848 D1 20040916; DE 60012848 T2 20050818; ES 2226687 T3 20050401; IT 1311353 B1 20020312; IT TO990979 A1 20010514; IT TO990979 D0 19991112

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN ITALIA S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO S.P.A., SANTENA, IT

- Document: DE 60012848

2017-07-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012848

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161115

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN ITALIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20160427

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041111

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226687 T3

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012848 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI