Global Patent Index - EP 1099819 A2

EP 1099819 A2 2001-05-16 - Corner guide fitting unit for mounting on a window, a door, or similar and method for manufacturing such a unit

Title (en)

Corner guide fitting unit for mounting on a window, a door, or similar and method for manufacturing such a unit

Title (de)

Beschlageinheit in Form einer Eckumlenkung zur Montage an einem Fenster, einer Tür oder dergleichen sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer derartigen Beschlageinheit

Title (fr)

Ensemble de ferrure de renvoi d'angle pour montage sur une fênetre, une porte, ou similaire et procedé de fabrication d'un tel ensemble

Publication

EP 1099819 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122671 A

Priority

DE 19954723 A

Abstract (en)

The ornamental unit has an outer rail (12) with a connected, relatively movable drive element (20), especially a drive rod (21), whereby the outer rail and drive element are held in a desired relative position in the rail's longitudinal direction by a securing element (1) to prevent relative movement. The rail and drive element are held essentially without play relative to each other in the longitudinal direction. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of manufacturing an ornamental unit.

Abstract (de)

Eine Beschlageinheit (11) zur Montage an einem Fenster, einer Tür od. dgl. umfaßt eine Stulpschiene (12) sowie ein mit der Stulpschiene (12) relativ zu dieser in deren Längsrichtung beweglich verbundenes Antriebselement (20), insbesondere eine entsprechende Treibstange (21). Dabei sind die Stulpschiene (12) und das Antriebselement (20), insbesondere die Treibstange (21), in einer Relativ-Sollage in Stulpschienenlängsrichtung über ein Sicherungselement (1) vorläufig gegen Relativbewegung in Stulpschienenlängsrichtung aneinander gehalten. Im Interesse einer Minimierung der sich bei der Fertigung der Beschlageinheit (11) ergebenden Toleranzen ist die mittels des Sicherungselementes (1) hergestellte Verbindung zwischen Stulpschiene (12) und Antriebselement (20), insbesondere Treibstange (21), in Stulpschienenlängsrichtung im wesentlichen spielfrei. Dementsprechend werden im Rahmen eines Verfahrens zur Herstellung einer Beschlageinheit (11) der vorstehenden Art die Stulpschiene (12) und das Antriebselement (20), insbesondere die Treibstange (21), über das Sicherungselement (1) in Stulpschienenlängsrichtung im wesentlichen spielfrei aneinander festgelegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/22; E05C 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/0012 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01); E05B 17/0004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099819 A2 20010516; EP 1099819 A3 20021218; EP 1099819 B1 20070124; AT 352692 T 20070215; DE 19954723 A1 20010607; DE 50013999 D1 20070315

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 352692 T

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013999 P 20070315

2007-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2006-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CORNER GUIDE FITTING UNIT FOR MOUNTING ON A WINDOW, A DOOR, OR SIMILAR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A UNIT

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030509

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/22 A, 7E 05C 9/24 B, 7E 05C 9/00 B, 7E 05B 17/00 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI