Global Patent Index - EP 1099822 A1

EP 1099822 A1 2001-05-16 - Overhead door

Title (en)

Overhead door

Title (de)

Deckenlauftor

Title (fr)

Porte sectionnelle

Publication

EP 1099822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811025 A

Priority

EP 99811025 A

Abstract (en)

The up-and-over door has vertical and horizontal profiled guides (24,26) at right angles to each other and along which move the laterally guided profiled panels (20) of the reinforced (18) slatted door. The vertical profiled guides lead into the horizontal guides and vice versa. The width of the profiled slats when the door is closed, in the change-over part between the horizontal and vertical guides is less than the width of the remaining profiled slats.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Deckenlauftor mit in im wesentlichen rechtwinklig zueinander angeordneten vertikalen und horizontalen Führungsprofilen (24,26) seitlich geführten Profillamellen (20) eines Lamellenpanzers (18) werden die Profillamellen (20) von den vertikalen Führungsprofilen (24) in die horizontalen Führungsprofile (26) und umgekehrt umgelenkt. Der Lamellenpanzer (18) setzt sich zusammen aus breiten Profillamellen (20) und schmalen Profillamellen (22). Zur Umlenkung des Lamellenpanzers (18) ist ein Umlenkelement (28) mit einer Hauptführungsnut (64) zur Führung der breiten Profillamellen (20) und mit einem Aussenanschlag (66) zur Anlage der sich bei geschlossenem Tor im Bereich des Umlenkelementes (28) befindenden, im unbelasteten Zustand quer zur Profillängsachse frei bewegbaren schmalen Profillamellen (22) angeordnet. Die Verwendung der schmalen Profillamellen (22) ermöglicht die Anordnung eines niedrigen Sturzes bzw. einer niedrigen Sturzblende (32) sowie eine einfache Abdichtung zwischen Sturz oder Sturzblende und Lamellenpanzer im Bereich der Umlenkung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/486 (2013.01); E06B 3/485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099822 A1 20010516; EP 1099822 B1 20030402; AT 236335 T 20030415; DE 59904864 D1 20030508; ES 2192372 T3 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2007-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031110

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1099822E

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-11-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031109

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192372 T3

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904864 P 20030508

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI

2002-11-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI