Global Patent Index - EP 1099823 A2

EP 1099823 A2 2001-05-16 - Frame leaf

Title (en)

Frame leaf

Title (de)

Rahmenblatt

Title (fr)

Feuille de cadre

Publication

EP 1099823 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118003 A

Priority

DE 29919354 U

Abstract (en)

The framed panel consists of a frame element in which is an opening (22) containing a filler panel (28) which has a protuberance on its front side. The filler rests against the reverse side of the frame element. On each side of the opening is a vertical holder-section (14,16) extending backwards from the reverse side of the frame element. The side of the holder sections facing the opening contains a vertical gap next to the reverse side of the frame element and into which the matching side edge of the filler panel extends. The back edge of the vertical gap has a pressure piece resting against the reverse side of the filler

Abstract (de)

Das Rahmenblatt wird insbesondere als Aufzugs-Glastürblatt verwendet. Es umfasst ein Rahmenelement (12), in dem eine Aufnahmeöffnung (22) vorgesehen ist, und ein plattenförmiges Füllmaterial (28), das an seiner Vorderseite einen Vorsprung (32) aufweist, der in der Aufnahmeöffnung (22) aufgenommen ist, wobei das Füllmaterial (28) angrenzend an die Aufnahmeöffung (22) an der Rückseite des Rahmenelements (12) anliegt. Um ein Rahmenblatt zu schaffen, das mit wenig Aufwand schnell herstellbar ist und sowohl auf der Vorderseite als auch auf der Rückseite ein schönes Erscheinungsbild hat, erstreckt sich beiderseits der Aufnahmeöffnung (22) jeweils ein vertikaler Halteabschnitt (14, 16) seitlich neben der Aufnahmeöffnung (22) von der Rückseite des Rahmenelements (12) nach hinten. In den Halteabschnitten (14, 16) ist auf ihrer der Aufnahmeöffnung (22) zugewandten Seite ein an die Rückseite des Rahmenelements (12) angrenzender Vertikalspalt (30) vorgesehen, in den das Füllmaterial (28) mit seinem entsprechenden Seitenrand eingreift. An dem hinteren Rand des Vertikalspaltes (28) des Halteabschnittes (14, 16) ist eine Anpresseinrichtung (20) angebracht, die an der Rückseite des Füllmaterials (28) anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/72 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/723 (2013.01); E06B 3/5427 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29919354 U1 20000127; AT 314551 T 20060115; CN 1157325 C 20040714; CN 1295967 A 20010523; DE 50011965 D1 20060202; EP 1099823 A2 20010516; EP 1099823 A3 20030702; EP 1099823 B1 20051228

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070216

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060822

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-04-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060408

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011965 P 20060202

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/72 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/54 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI