Global Patent Index - EP 1099826 A1

EP 1099826 A1 2001-05-16 - Positioning device for a turbine liner

Title (en)

Positioning device for a turbine liner

Title (de)

Sicherungsvorrichtung für ein Turbinendeckband

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour une virole de turbine

Publication

EP 1099826 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403105 A

Priority

FR 9914103 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a ring (103) assembled to the strut (102) of the turbine by an assembly of hooks (32, 35) nested on one side, and a rim locking stops (38, 39) and a mortise-and-tenon joint (41, 42) on the other side. The invention is characterised in that the mortise-and-tenon (41, 42) are separated from the rim locking stops (38, 39) to limit the clearances in axial direction produced by construction or thermal expansions, to improve the mechanical resistance and simplify manufacture.

Abstract (fr)

L'anneau 103 est joint à l'entretoise 102 de la turbine par un assemblage comprenant des crochets 32, 35 imbriqués d'un côté, et une butée de rebords 38, 39 ainsi qu'un assemblage à tenon et mortaise 41, 42 de l'autre côté. Conformément à l'invention, le tenon et la mortaise 41, 42 sont séparés des rebords en butée 38, 39 pour limiter les jeux en direction axiale produits par construction ou par des dilatations thermiques, pour améliorer la résistance mécanique et pour simplifier la fabrication. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24; F01D 11/00; F01D 11/08; F01D 11/12; F01D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F01D 11/08 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2013.01); F01D 11/005 (2013.01); F01D 25/246 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5197853 A 19930330 - CREEVY CLIFFORD S [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099826 A1 20010516; EP 1099826 B1 20050126; CA 2359049 A1 20010517; CA 2359049 C 20090113; DE 60017676 D1 20050303; DE 60017676 T2 20051229; ES 2232397 T3 20050601; FR 2800797 A1 20010511; FR 2800797 B1 20011207; JP 2003514182 A 20030415; JP 4181323 B2 20081112; RU 2256082 C2 20050710; UA 67818 C2 20011015; US 6575697 B1 20030610; WO 0134946 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141109

2015-11-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60017676

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-09-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SNECMA

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232397 T3

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017676 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARILLA, JEAN-BAPTISTE

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COULON, SYLVIE

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEBENEIX, PIERRE

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEUTARD, FLORENCE IRENE NOELLE

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RODRIGUES, PAUL

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSSET, PATRICE JEAN MARC

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI