Global Patent Index - EP 1099828 A2

EP 1099828 A2 2001-05-16 - Method for oscillating an electromagnetic actuator

Title (en)

Method for oscillating an electromagnetic actuator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anschwingen eines elektromagnetischen Aktuators

Title (fr)

Procédé pour osciller un actionneur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1099828 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121922 A

Priority

DE 19954416 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves alternately stimulating magnet coils (4A,4B) at a defined frequency starting from a rest state, in which the armature (4D) is held centrally by restoring springs (2A,2B), using an essentially sinusoidal alternating voltage instead of the conventional rectangular wave voltage. The voltage can be either a variable continuous voltage or a variable pulse-width modulated voltage.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Anschwingen eines ein Schaltelement, insbesondere ein Brennkraftmaschinen-Hubventil, betätigenden elektromagnetischen Aktuators, in welchem ein auf das Schaltelement einwirkender Anker oszillierend zwischen zwei Elektro-Magnetspulen jeweils gegen die Kraft zumindest einer Rückstellfeder durch alternierende Bestromung der Elektromagnet-Spulen bewegt wird, so daß das Schaltelement mit dem Anker und den Rückstellfedern ein schwingungsfähiges Feder-Masse-System darstellt, und wobei ausgehend vom Ruhezustand des Systems, in welchem der Anker von den Rückstellfedern im wesentlichen in der Mitte zwischen diesen Magnetspulen gehalten wird, zum Anschwingen dieses Feder-Masse-Systemes die Elektro-Magnetspulen abwechselnd durch Beaufschlagung mit elektrischer Wechsel-Spannung von bestimmter Frequenz erregt werden. Erfindungsgemäß wird anstelle des bisher üblichen im wesentlichen rechteckförmigen Verlaufes der Wechsel-Spannung über der Zeit eine im wesentlichen sinusförmige Wechsel-Spannung an die Elektro-Magnetspulen angelegt, und zwar entweder in Form eines veränderbaren stetigen Spannungsverlaufes oder in Form eines entsprechenden veränderbaren pulsweitenmodulierten Spannungsverlaufs, da hiermit weitere Einflußfaktoren berücksichtigt werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H02K 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0318 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099828 A2 20010516; EP 1099828 A3 20020327; EP 1099828 B1 20040331; DE 19954416 A1 20010517; DE 50005882 D1 20040506; ES 2215537 T3 20041016; JP 2001217123 A 20010810; US 6390113 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081007

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081007

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051008

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215537 T3

2004-10-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041007

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005882 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020214

2003-01-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI