Global Patent Index - EP 1099845 A2

EP 1099845 A2 2001-05-16 - Piston with a connection between a cooling conduit and a wrist pin bore

Title (en)

Piston with a connection between a cooling conduit and a wrist pin bore

Title (de)

Kolben mit einer Verbindung von einem Kühlkanal zu einer Kolbenbolzenbohrung

Title (fr)

Piston avec une connexion entre un conduit de refroidissement et un alésage d'un axe de piston

Publication

EP 1099845 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120969 A

Priority

DE 19954725 A

Abstract (en)

The piston (1) has a gudgeon pin bore (4) for accommodating a gudgeon pin (5) and a cooling channel (6) arranged in the region between the bore and a piston combustion surface (9), especially within an annular field (2). The cooling channel has at least one connection (7) to the gudgeon pin bore. The connection(s) can be produced after piston manufacture, especially by drilling.

Abstract (de)

Ausgehend von einem Kolben (1), insbesondere für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einer Kolbenbolzenbohrung (4) zur Aufnahme eines Kolbenbolzens (5) sowie mit einem innerhalb eines Ringfeldes (2) angeordneten Kühlkanal (6), wird die Aufgabe, eine bessere Ölzufuhr zu der Bolzenbohrung mit dem Ziel besserer Schmierung und Kühlung zu erreichen, dadurch gelöst, daß der Kühlkanal (6) über zumindest eine Verbindung (7) mit der Kolbenbolzenbohrung (4) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2013.01); B22C 9/105 (2013.01); B22C 9/108 (2013.01); B22C 21/14 (2013.01); F02F 2200/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4907545 A 19900313 - MILLS FLOYD D [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099845 A2 20010516; EP 1099845 A3 20020213; DE 19954725 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050418

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI