Global Patent Index - EP 1099858 A2

EP 1099858 A2 2001-05-16 - Lifting cylinder unit for a loading platform

Title (en)

Lifting cylinder unit for a loading platform

Title (de)

Liftzylindereinheit für eine Hebebühne

Title (fr)

Unité de vérin pour un hayon élévateur

Publication

EP 1099858 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124050 A

Priority

DE 19954577 A

Abstract (en)

The lift cylinder unit (1) for a raisable platform has a static bar tube (2) with a longitudinal axis (9) connected in one axial end area with a bar head (4). Outside the bar tube is a cylinder tube (14) so arranged, that it is movable along the longitudinal axis relatively to the bar tube. In one of the axial end areas of the cylinder tube is a cylinder base (15), firmly connected with the cylinder tube. A guide bush (18) with a force engagement surface (30) is firmly connected with the outer surface (22) of the cylinder tube and inside the bar tube is a pressure chamber (31), which via a connecting bore (7) is fed with hydraulic medium. Via a dynamic seal (24) and a running surface (25) it is sealed in relation to the atmosphere.

Abstract (de)

Eine Liftzylindereinheit (1) weist ein ortsfestes Stangenrohr (2) mit einer Längsachse (3) auf, das in einem seiner axialen Endbereiche mit einem Stangenkopf (4) fest verbunden ist. Außerhalb des Stangenrohrs (2) ist ein Zylinderrohr (14) so angeordnet, daß es entlang der Längsachse (3) relativ zu dem Stangenrohr (2) verschieblich ist. In einem der axialen Endbereiche des Zylinderrohrs (14) ist ein Zylinderboden (15) vorgesehen, der fest mit dem Zylinderrohr (14) verbunden ist. Eine eine Kraftangriffsfläche (30) aufweisende Führungsbuchse (18) ist mit der äußeren Oberfläche (22) des Zylinderrohrs (14) fest verbunden. Innerhalb des Stangenrohrs (2) ist ein Druckraum (31) angeordnet, der über eine Anschlußbohrung (7) mit einem Hydraulikmedium versorgt und über eine dynamische Dichtung (24) und eine Lauffläche (25) gegenüber der Umgebung abgedichtet ist. Die Liftzylindereinheit (1) ist in Plungerbauweise ausgebildet. Die dynamische Dichtung (24) ist im Bereich der inneren Oberfläche (23) der Führungsbuchse (18) angeordnet. Die Lauffläche (25) für die dynamische Dichtung (24) ist im Bereich der äußeren Oberfläche (26) des Stangenrohrs (2) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/14; F15B 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/149 (2013.01); F15B 15/1433 (2013.01); F15B 15/1457 (2013.01); F15B 15/204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099858 A2 20010516; EP 1099858 A3 20030917; EP 1099858 B1 20061011; AT 342448 T 20061115; DE 19954577 C1 20010621; US 6378412 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PACOMA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120116

2011-06-01 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110513

2011-05-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110421 AND 20110427

2011-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PACOMA GMBH

- Free text: HYCO PACOMA GMBH#KOENIGSBERGER STRASSE 12#37269 ESCHWEGE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- PACOMA GMBH#KOENIGSBERGER STRASSE 12#37269 ESCHWEGE (DE)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-03-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070122

2007-01-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070111

2007-01-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070111

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI