Global Patent Index - EP 1099904 A1

EP 1099904 A1 2001-05-16 - Household cooking hob gas burner

Title (en)

Household cooking hob gas burner

Title (de)

Hauskochfeldgasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour table de cuisson domestique

Publication

EP 1099904 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403075 A

Priority

FR 9914136 A

Abstract (en)

The gas burner (1) for a domestic cooking hob has a burner head (3) with branches (4) with openings (10) for the primary mixture extending from a central hub (5) which is slightly raised above the base plate (2). The hub has a passage for the primary mixture and an independent secondary air passage having an opening (8) in the base plate. The hub has deflectors (9) for the secondary air flow to feed it between the branches.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un brûleur à gaz (1) pour table de cuisson domestique, et plus spécifiquement un brûleur en étoile à air secondaire. Le brûleur selon l'invention comprend une tête de brûleur (3) avec plusieurs branches (4) munies d'orifices (10) pour le mélange primaire, et s'étendant d'un corps central (5), la tête étant légèrement surélevée par rapport à une plaque d'âtre (2). Il comprend en outre un passage pour le mélange primaire en communication avec ladite tête, et un passage d'air secondaire indépendant du passage pour le mélange primaire. Le passage d'air secondaire s'effectue par une ouverture (8) dans la plaque d'âtre, positionnée sensiblement sous le corps central de la tête. Le brûleur selon l'invention comporte en outre des moyens de déviation (9) de l'air secondaire permettant, entre deux branches, de rabattre au moins une partie du flux d'air secondaire le long des branches, sensiblement au-dessus des orifices. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099904 A1 20010516; EP 1099904 B1 20040211; DE 60008190 D1 20040318; FR 2800845 A1 20010511; FR 2800845 B1 20020125

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-08-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-06-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2004-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-05-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008190 P 20040318

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI