Global Patent Index - EP 1099905 A1

EP 1099905 A1 2001-05-16 - Household cooking hob gas burner

Title (en)

Household cooking hob gas burner

Title (de)

Hauskochfeldgasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour table de cuisson domestique

Publication

EP 1099905 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403076 A

Priority

FR 9914137 A

Abstract (en)

The gas burner for a domestic hob has a burner head (3) with branches (4) having openings (6) for the primary air fed by a passage (12). The head is raised above the base plate. Secondary air is fed by a second passage extending through the base plate and having ducts to allow vertical flow of the secondary air along the central head. The secondary air flow ducts have raised lugs 99) between each branch pair at the level of the base plate and defining a vertical surface.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un brûleur à gaz (1) pour table de cuisson domestique. Le brûleur selon l'invention comprend une tête de brûleur (3) avec plusieurs branches (4) munies d'orifices (6) pour le mélange primaire, et s'étendant d'un corps central (5), la tête étant légèrement surélevée par rapport à une plaque d'âtre (2). Il comprend en outre un passage (12) pour le mélange primaire en communication avec ladite tête, et un passage d'air secondaire indépendant du passage pour le mélange primaire. Selon l'invention, le passage d'air secondaire s'effectue par une ouverture dans la plaque d'âtre, positionnée sensiblement sous le corps central de la tête. Le brûleur comprend en outre des moyens de canalisation de l'air secondaire permettant entre deux branches, un écoulement sensiblement vertical du flux d'air secondaire le long du corps central. Les moyens de canalisation comprennent par exemple un ensemble de créneaux hauts (9) positionnés chacun entre deux branches, au niveau de la plaque d'âtre, et présentant une paroi sensiblement verticale, permettant l'écoulement sensiblement vertical du flux d'air secondaire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099905 A1 20010516; EP 1099905 B1 20060208; DE 60025899 D1 20060420; DE 60025899 T2 20060831; DE 60025899 T8 20070125; ES 2257274 T3 20060801; FR 2800846 A1 20010511; FR 2800846 B1 20020125

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081108

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081108

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257274 T3

2006-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025899 P 20060420

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060208

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI