Global Patent Index - EP 1099914 A1

EP 1099914 A1 2001-05-16 - Air outlet

Title (en)

Air outlet

Title (de)

Luftauslass

Title (fr)

Sortie d'air

Publication

EP 1099914 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124130 A

Priority

DE 19954162 A

Abstract (en)

A disc in which are air-passages can be twisted in relation to a sheet metal (3) basic body(2). Air-chambers are formed by means of partition elements between the basic body and the disc. Outlet slits in the basic body belong to the air chambers (49). The partition elements are in the form of air-guide elements (9,10) defining the flow paths (48) which have a constant cross-section along their length. Each air chamber has an outlet slit (5,6).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Luftauslass (1) mit einem Grundkörper (2) vorgeschlagen, an dem eine Luftdurchlässe (20,21) aufweisende Scheibe (18) verdrehbar gelagert ist, wobei zwischen dem Grundkörper (2) und der Scheibe (18) mittels Trennelementen Luftkammern (49) ausgebildet sind, denen den Grundkörper (2) durchsetzende Auslassschlitze (5,6) zugeordnet sind. Der Luftauslass (1) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Trennelemente als über ihre Länge etwa querschnittskonstante, Strömungswege (48) begrenzende Luftleitelemente (9,10) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/06; F24F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/12 (2013.01); F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099914 A1 20010516; EP 1099914 B1 20041020; AT 280366 T 20041115; DE 19954162 C1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 280366 T

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH GB IT LI

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH GB IT LI

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI