Global Patent Index - EP 1099915 A1

EP 1099915 A1 2001-05-16 - Heat exchanger with at least two juxtaposed sections

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with at least two juxtaposed sections

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit mindenstens zwei nebeneinanderliegenden Abschnitten

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur avec au moins deux sections juxtaposées

Publication

EP 1099915 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203949 A

Priority

NL 1013537 A

Abstract (en)

A heat exchanger, comprising a burner chamber, a flue duct and connecting means for a flue gas discharge, wherein at least one passage is provided for passing through a medium to be heated, there being provided at least a first and a second section, which sections extend next to each other, the burner chamber linking up adjacent a first end of the first section, while a first part of the flue duct extends in the first section and a second part of the flue duct extends in the second section, while the first part of the flue duct is connected, adjacent the second end of the first section remote from the first end, with the second part of the flue duct, adjacent the second end of the second section, the at least one passage for the medium to be heated extending at least between the first and an adjacent second section, between the burner chamber and the second ends of the first and second section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099915 A1 20010516; NL 1013537 C2 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060531

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031103

2002-06-05 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-03-20 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI