Global Patent Index - EP 1099925 A2

EP 1099925 A2 2001-05-16 - Method for coating the interior surface of a gun barrel

Title (en)

Method for coating the interior surface of a gun barrel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres

Title (fr)

Procédé pour revêtir la surface intérieure d'un tube de canon

Publication

EP 1099925 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117864 A

Priority

DE 19954652 A

Abstract (en)

The internal coating process for the barrel (1) of a weapon comprises applying an intermediate coating (5) by explosive cladding. A high melting point coating (3) is then applied over this by electroplating. The intermediate coating has higher thermal conductivity than the barrel and greater ductility than that of the high melting point coating.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres (1), auf dessen innere Oberfläche (2) zur Vermeidung von Erosionen mindestens in einem Teilbereich (4) mindestens eine aus einem Werkstoff mit hohem Schmelzpunkt bestehende Deckschicht (3) durch Elektroplattieren aufgebracht wird. Um das Waffenrohr (1) mit einer Innenbeschichtung zu versehen, mit der erreicht wird, daß die Rohrerosionen geringer sind als bei vergleichbaren Waffenrohren, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß vor dem Aufbringen der Deckschicht (3) mindestens eine Zwischenschicht (5) durch Sprengplattieren auf die innere Oberfläche (2) des Waffenrohres (1) aufgebracht wird, die aus einem Werkstoff besteht, der eine Wärmeleitung besitzt, welche größer ist als die Wärmeleitung des Waffenrohres (1), und der eine Duktilität aufweist, die größer ist als die Duktilität der Deckschicht (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/04 (2006.01); F41A 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/021 (2013.01); C23C 28/023 (2013.01); F41A 21/04 (2013.01); F41A 21/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099925 A2 20010516; EP 1099925 A3 20010822; DE 19954652 A1 20010517; US 6500326 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI