Global Patent Index - EP 1099926 A1

EP 1099926 A1 2001-05-16 - Dual mode explosive warhead for use against conventional targets and against tactical ballistic missiles

Title (en)

Dual mode explosive warhead for use against conventional targets and against tactical ballistic missiles

Title (de)

Explosiver Gefechtskopf mit zwei Betriebsarten, der gegen konventionelle Ziele und gegen taktische ballistische Flugkörper verwendet werden kann

Title (fr)

Charge militaire duale, pour missile surface air, contre cibles conventionnelles et missiles balistiques tactiques

Publication

EP 1099926 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402942 A

Priority

FR 9914074 A

Abstract (en)

The explosive charge comprises a main charge with a series of basic blocks (10) which are optionally preformed, surrounded by an outer fragmentation shell (16), an igniter (12) for the main charge which produces the fragmentation, a series of cord fuses (18) on the outer shell, and explosive columns (20a, 20b) of small diameter along the axis of the main charge to disperse the main charge and the fragments. The explosive charge comprises a main charge with a series of basic blocks (10) which are optionally preformed, surrounded by an outer fragmentation shell (16), an igniter (12) for the main charge which produces the fragmentation, a series of cord fuses (18) on the outer shell, and explosive columns (20a, 20b) of small diameter along the axis of the main charge to disperse the main charge and the fragments. The charge fulfills two different functions: the production of small high-speed fragments, weighing a few grams and travelling at 1500-2000 m/s, and heavier slower fragments of tens to hundreds of grams travelling at about 100 m/s.

Abstract (fr)

Charge militaire pour missile surface-air conçue pour la destruction fonctionnelle ou structurale, d'une part, de cibles conventionnelles telles que avions de combat, missiles tactiques subsoniques ou supersoniques et d'autre part, de missiles balistiques tactiques caractérisée en ce qu'elle comprend un chargement explosif principal constitué d'une pluralité de blocs élémentaires (10) préformés ou non ; une enveloppe génératrice d'éclats prédéterminés (16) disposée périphériquement audit chargement explosif (10) ; un système de mise à feu (12) du chargement explosif, la détonation de ce dernier provoquant la fragmentation prédéterminée de l'enveloppe génératrice d'éclats ; un système de cordeaux détonants (18) prévus sur ladite enveloppe génératrice d'éclats et, des colonnes d'explosifs de faible diamètre (20a, 20b) positionnés selon l'axe du chargement explosif de façon à réaliser une dislocation et une dispersion dudit chargement explosif et de l'enveloppe génératrice d'éclats découpée par ses cordeaux détonants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/22; F42B 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099926 A1 20010516; EP 1099926 B1 20040121; DE 60007821 D1 20040226; DE 60007821 T2 20040715; FR 2800866 A1 20010511; FR 2800866 B1 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007821 P 20040226

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI