Global Patent Index - EP 1099927 A1

EP 1099927 A1 2001-05-16 - Ignition transfer charge for coupled cutting charges

Title (en)

Ignition transfer charge for coupled cutting charges

Title (de)

Übertragungsladung für aneinandergereihte Schneideladungen

Title (fr)

Charge de transfert pour des charges découpeuses couplées

Publication

EP 1099927 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124018 A

Priority

DE 19954657 A

Abstract (en)

A cutting charge comprises planar sides and a detonating charge above the main charge. The detonating charge extends between the side faces in the longitudinal direction. A detonation transfer unit is located at one or both ends of the detonating charge. The transfer unit has a metallic funnel section which forms a jet. The funnel consists of aluminum and has an angle of 20-40 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Eine Schleppzündung für aneinandergereihte Schneidladungen (10) weist Zündübertrager (8) auf. Die Zündübertrager (8) sind Stirnseitig an den Zündladungen (7) vorgesehen und bestehen aus jeweils einem Trichter aus Aluminium mit einem Winkel von 20°-40°. Damit sind größere Streuungen der Detonationsgeschwindigkeit in den Zündladungen (7) zulässig. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 19/09; F42B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/02 (2006.01); F42C 19/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/09 (2013.01); F42B 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099927 A1 20010516; DE 19954657 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI