Global Patent Index - EP 1100018 A2

EP 1100018 A2 2001-05-16 - USB-Interface Equipped Device

Title (en)

USB-Interface Equipped Device

Title (de)

Gerät versehen mit USB-Schnittstelle

Title (fr)

Dispositif muni d'une interface USB

Publication

EP 1100018 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00310046 A

Priority

  • JP 32042699 A
  • JP 32295599 A
  • JP 32226799 A
  • JP 33347699 A

Abstract (en)

A method for communication control of a USB-equipped device that has a vendor identification (VID), a product identification (PID) and a device identification number (DID) that is different from the VID and PID. The method comprises transmitting the DID, together with the VID and the PID to a host computer when the USB-equipped device is plugged in; identifying in the host computer the model of the USB-equipped device based on the transmitted VID and PID and identifying a USB-equipped device as a target of communication among a plurality of USB-equipped devices using the DID transmitted, thereby to established communication with said USB-equipped device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 12/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4411 (2013.01); G06F 12/0661 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100018 A2 20010516; EP 1100018 A3 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI