Global Patent Index - EP 1100076 A2

EP 1100076 A2 2001-05-16 - Multimode speech encoder with gain smoothing

Title (en)

Multimode speech encoder with gain smoothing

Title (de)

Multimodaler Sprachkodierer mit Glättung des Gewinnfaktors

Title (fr)

Codeur de parole multimode avec lissage du gain

Publication

EP 1100076 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124232 A

Priority

JP 31953499 A

Abstract (en)

A mode discriminating circuit (300) extracts a feature quantity from a voice signal and makes mode discrimination. When the output of the circuit (300) represents a predetermined mode, a smoothing circuit (450) executes time-wise smoothing of at least either one of excitation gain, adaptive codebook gain, spectral parameter and excitation signal level. A multiplexer (400) locally reproduces a synthesized signal by using a signal obtained through the smoothing, and feeds out a combination of the outputs of spectral parameter calculating circuit, mode discriminating circuit, adaptive codebook circuit, excitation quantizing circuit and gain quantizing circuit. Thus it makes possible to provide a voice coding and a voice decoding apparatus, which permit good coded sound quality to be obtained for voice with background noise superimposed thereon even at a low bit rate. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/12 (2006.01); G10L 11/06 (2006.01); G10L 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100076 A2 20010516; EP 1100076 A3 20031210; CA 2325322 A1 20010510; JP 2001142499 A 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/14 A

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 21/02 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI