Global Patent Index - EP 1100100 A1

EP 1100100 A1 2001-05-16 - A circuit for detecting the state of electrical switches

Title (en)

A circuit for detecting the state of electrical switches

Title (de)

Schaltung zur Zustandserkennung eines elektrischen Schalters

Title (fr)

Circuit pour détecter l'état d'un contact électrique

Publication

EP 1100100 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00124515 A

Priority

IT TO990969 A

Abstract (en)

A circuit for detecting the state of electrical switches, for example, switches (SWi) in a motor vehicle, is described and comprises a network (B1, B2) which supplies the switches (SWi) and which can produce signals indicative of the operative state of each switch, and a control unit (P) which can correctly interpret the operative states of the switches (SWi). The supply network comprises first and second circuit branches (B1; B2) arranged, respectively, for continuously supplying a monitoring current and for selectively supplying a diagnosis current of substantially greater intensity than the monitoring current. The control unit (P) detects and compares the signals indicative of the state of each switch (SWi) which are acquired when the switch is supplied by the monitoring current or by the diagnosis current, and interprets the state of the switch (SWi) from a comparison thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/16; G01R 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/167 (2013.01); H01H 1/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100100 A1 20010516; EP 1100100 B1 20061004; DE 60031069 D1 20061116; DE 60031069 T2 20070208; ES 2267448 T3 20070316; IT 1311343 B1 20020312; IT TO990969 A1 20010514; IT TO990969 D0 19991112

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151110

2016-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161229

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151109

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2267448 T3

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031069 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI SISTEMI ELETTRONICI S.P.A.

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERGAMINI, ALESSANDRO

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRANDOLA, FAUSTINO

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MITIDIERI COSTANZA, ALESSANDRA

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORELLO, MARCO

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VIGANO',WILLIAM

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI SISTEMI ELETTRONICI S.P.A.

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI