Global Patent Index - EP 1100107 A2

EP 1100107 A2 2001-05-16 - Getter, flat-panel display and method of production thereof

Title (en)

Getter, flat-panel display and method of production thereof

Title (de)

Getter, Flachanzeige und Methode zur Produktion derselben

Title (fr)

Getter, affichage à panneau plat et méthode pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1100107 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00403155 A

Priority

  • JP 32330199 A
  • JP 32408899 A
  • JP 2000262754 A

Abstract (en)

A getter (43A) comprising a support member (41) which is formed on a substratum (40) and which has a convexo-concave surface or is constituted of a porous material member, and a gas-trapping layer (42) formed on the support member in conformity with the surface of the support member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 7/18; H01J 29/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/39 (2006.01); H01J 1/30 (2006.01); H01J 7/18 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 9/14 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 17/49 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 29/62 (2006.01); H01J 29/94 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 7/186 (2013.01); H01J 29/94 (2013.01); H01J 2329/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100107 A2 20010516; EP 1100107 A3 20040602; CN 1298196 A 20010606; JP 2001210225 A 20010803; KR 20010051595 A 20010625; TW 476974 B 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041203

2005-03-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI