Global Patent Index - EP 1100111 A1

EP 1100111 A1 2001-05-16 - Deflection arrangement for separating two particle beams

Title (en)

Deflection arrangement for separating two particle beams

Title (de)

Ablenkeinheit zur Separation zweier Teilchenstrahlen

Title (fr)

Unité de déviation pour la séparation de deux faisceaux de particules

Publication

EP 1100111 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99122581 A

Priority

EP 99122581 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a deflection arrangement for separating two particle beams, with an electrostatic deflector and a magnetic deflector having a common optical axis and generating crossed electrostatic and magnetic deflection fields, wherein the two particle beams pass the deflection arrangements from opposite sides. The two deflectors are adapted to deflect one of the two beams achromatically by an angle a and the other beam by an angle beta ≥ 3 alpha with respect to its angle of incidence, respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/28; H01J 37/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 23/225 (2006.01); H01J 37/05 (2006.01); H01J 37/147 (2006.01); H01J 37/244 (2006.01); H01J 37/28 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G01Q 60/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/147 (2013.01); H01J 37/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4362945 A 19821207 - RIECKE WOLFGANG D
  • [A] US 4714833 A 19871222 - ROSE HARALD [DE], et al
  • [AD] EP 0917177 A1 19990519 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TESTING [DE]
  • [A] MEISBURGER W D ET AL: "LOW-VOLTAGE ELECTRON-OPTICAL SYSTEM FOR THE HIGH-SPEED INSPECTION OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B, vol. 10, no. 6, 1 November 1992 (1992-11-01), pages 2804 - 2808, XP000332485
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 013 (E - 1304) 11 January 1993 (1993-01-11)
  • [AD] TELIEPS W.: "Surface Imaging with LEEM", APPL. PHYS. A, SOLIDS SURF., vol. A44, September 1987 (1987-09-01), pages 55 - 61, XP000885740

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100111 A1 20010516; EP 1100111 B1 20021009; DE 69903439 D1 20021114; DE 69903439 T2 20030703; JP 2001148227 A 20010529; US 6509569 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903439

- Effective date: 20130601

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101112

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101112

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903439 20021114

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI