Global Patent Index - EP 1100113 A2

EP 1100113 A2 2001-05-16 - Dielectric barrier discharge lamp

Title (en)

Dielectric barrier discharge lamp

Title (de)

Dielektrische Barrier-Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge à barrière diélectrique

Publication

EP 1100113 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123542 A

Priority

JP 31215599 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a dielectric barrier discharge lamp device which allows ultraviolet rays to be uniformly radiated onto a workpiece having a large surface area and which can be easily adapted to the size of workpiece. In the dielectric barrier discharge lamp device of the present invention at least one dielectric barrier discharge lamp is arranged in a hermetically sealed casing, said casing comprising a hollow longitudinally extending main part being closed at both ends by end parts, at least a portion of said main part of the casing defining a window allowing light radiated from the at least one dielectric barrier discharge lamp to pass therethrough onto the workpiece. At least one end part of the casing is provided with a passage allowing inert gas to be introduced into the casing, and at least one end part of the casing is adapted such as to allow loading or unloading of the at least one dielectric barrier discharge lamp. A plurality of casings are arranged side by side with their windows facing the workpiece to be irradiated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 65/04; G21K 5/00; H01J 61/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01); B01J 19/12 (2006.01); G21K 5/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/52 (2006.01); H01L 21/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/67 (2006.01); H05B 3/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/04 (2006.01); H05G 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05G 2/003 (2013.01); H01J 65/04 (2013.01); H01L 21/67115 (2013.01); H05B 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100113 A2 20010516; EP 1100113 A3 20060510; EP 1100113 B1 20140910; JP 2001135279 A 20010518; JP 3591393 B2 20041117; KR 100470934 B1 20050221; KR 20010051405 A 20010625; TW 457513 B 20011001; US 6657367 B1 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150611

2015-06-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60048714

2014-12-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-10-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60048714

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2014-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2014-08-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 3/04 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 61/52 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05G 2/00 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G21K 5/00 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/67 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 19/12 20060101ALI20140512BHEP

2014-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 65/04 20060101AFI20140512BHEP

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091005

2007-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2006-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 65/04 20060101AFI20010321BHEP

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G21K 5/00 20060101ALI20060323BHEP

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 61/52 20060101ALI20060323BHEP

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 19/12 20060101ALI20060323BHEP

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/00 20060101ALI20060323BHEP

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI