Global Patent Index - EP 1100146 A2

EP 1100146 A2 2001-05-16 - Method for tracking on a selected satellite and control unit for directing a pivotable antenna

Title (en)

Method for tracking on a selected satellite and control unit for directing a pivotable antenna

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines ausgewählten Satelliten und Steuereinheit zum Ausrichten einer verschwenkbaren Antenne

Title (fr)

Méthode de poursuite d'un satellite sélectionné et unité de commande pour diriger une antenne pivotante

Publication

EP 1100146 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250375 A

Priority

DE 19954531 A

Abstract (en)

The satellite includes an antenna which is pivotable in a horizontal and a vertical plane. The antenna is controlled in a theoretical receiving direction corresponding to a known location of the satellite. The electrical energy received in this direction is compared with a known optimally possible satellite energy for the selected satellite. In the event of a deviation from the optimally possible energy, the antenna is pivoted in a direction of increasing electrical energy. An Independent claim is included for a control unit for aligning a pivotable antenna.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient zum Ansteuern eines ausgewählten Satelliten von einem vorgegebenen durch geografische Koordination bekanntem Standpunkt mit einer Antenne, die jeweils in einer horizontalen und vertikalen Ebene verschwenkbar gelagert ist. Die Antenne wird in eine einem bekannten Standort des Satelliten entsprechende theoretische Empfangsrichtung gesteuert, die in dieser Empfangsrichtung empfangene elektrische Energie wird mit einer vom ausgewählten Satelliten bekannten optimal möglichen Satellitenenergie verglichen. Die Antenne wird im Falle einer Abweichung der empfangenen elektrischen Energie von der optimal möglichen Satellitenenergie des ausgewählten Satelliten in Richtung eines Empfangs wachsender elektrischer Energie verschwenkt. Die theoretische Empfangsrichtung der Antenne wird aus einer für den ausgewählten Satelliten vorbekannten Orbitposition und Angaben über die geografischen Koordinaten des Standortes berechnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/08; H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/18; H01Q 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/18 (2006.01); H01Q 1/34 (2006.01); H01Q 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1257 (2013.01); H01Q 1/18 (2013.01); H01Q 1/34 (2013.01); H01Q 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100146 A2 20010516; EP 1100146 A3 20020213; CA 2325355 A1 20010512; DE 19954531 A1 20020718

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI