Global Patent Index - EP 1100156 A1

EP 1100156 A1 2001-05-16 - A connector and a connector assembly

Title (en)

A connector and a connector assembly

Title (de)

Steckverbinderanordnung

Title (fr)

Connecteur et son assemblage

Publication

EP 1100156 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01101193 A

Priority

  • EP 99109391 A
  • JP 15607598 A
  • JP 6196999 A

Abstract (en)

The invention refers to a connector, comprising: a connector housing (1) comprising, substantially parallel upper and lower walls (19), at least one cavity (4) extending through said connector housing (1), and at least one terminal fitting (2) at least partially insertable into the at least one cavity (4) formed in the connector housing (1), said terminal fitting (2) having a fitting projecting portion (5) provided at the leading end thereof and projecting from the front end (18) of the connector housing (1) without being surrounded. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/42 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/516 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/516 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01R 13/4361 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963008 A2 19991208; EP 0963008 A3 20010418; EP 0963008 B1 20080319; CN 1171358 C 20041013; CN 1238580 A 19991215; DE 69935145 D1 20070329; DE 69935145 T2 20071122; DE 69938376 D1 20080430; DE 69938376 T2 20090402; EP 1100156 A1 20010516; EP 1100156 B1 20070214; JP 2000058190 A 20000225; JP 3387438 B2 20030317

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-19 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20170622

2017-06-19 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69935145

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935145 P 20070329

2007-02-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0963008 P

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-05-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 963008

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI