Global Patent Index - EP 1100292 A1

EP 1100292 A1 2001-05-16 - Control circuit for high-pressure gas discharge lamp in a vehicule

Title (en)

Control circuit for high-pressure gas discharge lamp in a vehicule

Title (de)

Schaltung zum Betreiben einer Wechselstrom-Hochdruckgasentladungslampe für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande de lampe à décharge haute pression dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 1100292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124484 A

Priority

DE 19954489 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit has a bias device, an ignition device and a symmetrical lamp filter between the ignition device and a high pressure gas discharge lamp (GDL) enclosed by at least one reflector. The symmetrical lamp filter has a filter capacitance (C1) parallel to the gas discharge lamp and a choke coil (L1,L2) in each of the leads between the parallel circuit and the ignition device. A capacitor (C2,C3) is connected between the lamp reflector and one or each of the lamp supply lines.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Schaltung zum Betreiben einer Wechselstrom-Hochdruckgasentladungslampe für ein Kraftfahrzeug, mit einem Vorschaltgerät, einem Überlagerungszündgerät, einem symmetrischen Lampenfilter und einer Hochdruckgasentladungslampe, die zumindest teilweise von einem Reflektor umgeben ist, wobei das symmetrische Lampenfilter zwischen der Hochdruckgasentladungslampe und der Überlagerungszündung angeordnet ist, mit einer Filterkapazität parallel zur Hochdruckgasentladungslampe und je einer Drossel in den Verbindungsleitungen zwischen dieser Parallelschaltung und der Zündschaltung, sowie mit zwei Lampenversorgungsleitungen im Eingang der Zündschaltung, wobei mindestens ein Kondensator zwischen dem Reflektor und mindestens einer der Lampenversorgungsleitungen angeordnet ist. Hierdurch werden die von der Hochdruckgasentladungslampe abgegebenen Störungen ins Zündgerät abgeleitet und somit eine Einkopplung der Störimpulse in die Fahrzeugmasse und damit ins Bordnetz wirkungsvoll vermieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/14; B60Q 1/00; B60Q 1/04; F21S 8/12; H05B 41/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1100292 A1 20010516; EP 1100292 B1 20020807; AT 222045 T 20020815; DE 19954489 A1 20010517; ES 2180494 T3 20030216; US 6624581 B1 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HELLA GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO., 59557 LIPPSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 50000352

2016-06-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50000352

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141109

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141109

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101110

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101109

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-06-13 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DIE BENENNUNG CH/LI WURDE VOR ERTEILUNG ZURUECKGENOMMEN.

2003-04-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1100292E

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180494 T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000352 20020912

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-08-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222045 T 20020815

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI