Global Patent Index - EP 1100410 A1

EP 1100410 A1 2001-05-23 - BIFURCATED STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE

Title (en)

BIFURCATED STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES ABZWEIGENDEN STENTS UND METHODE ZU SEINER ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME SERVANT A APPLIQUER UN STENT BIFURQUE ET MODE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1100410 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934434 A

Priority

  • CA 9900695 W
  • US 9495098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007523A1] An endovascular sleeve which can be utilized to navigate a pair of guidewires to a bifurcated body passageway such that, once in place, the guidewires are substantially untwisted or untangled. This greatly facilitates delivery of the bifurcated stent to the bifurcated artery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/954 (2013.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/06 (2013.01); A61F 2/86 (2013.01); A61M 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/954 (2013.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01); A61F 2/86 (2013.01); A61F 2002/065 (2013.01); A61M 2025/0034 (2013.01); A61M 2025/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007523A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007523 A1 20000217; AU 5023199 A 20000228; AU 762447 B2 20030626; CA 2339133 A1 20000217; CA 2339133 C 20081118; CN 1171565 C 20041020; CN 1311646 A 20010905; EP 1100410 A1 20010523; JP 2002522114 A 20020723; JP 4435981 B2 20100324; NZ 510186 A 20031031; NZ 527648 A 20050429

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-05-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVYSIO MEDICAL DEVICES ULC

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI