Global Patent Index - EP 1100428 A1

EP 1100428 A1 2001-05-23 - A BAG OR A BAG SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING AND STORING BLOOD AND A METHOD THEREFOR

Title (en)

A BAG OR A BAG SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING AND STORING BLOOD AND A METHOD THEREFOR

Title (de)

SACK ODER SACKSYSTEM ZUM SAMMELN UND AUFBEWAHREN VON BLUT SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

SAC OU SYSTEME A SAC POUR PRELEVEMENT ET STOCKAGE DE SANG ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1100428 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934518 A

Priority

  • DK 9900422 W
  • DK PA199800983 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006079A1] The present invention relates to a bag or a bag system for collecting and storing blood comprising at least two primary storage chambers and at least two secondary storage chambers, arranged in such a relation to each other so that each of the storage chambers can be sealed off from the others, and a method for collecting and storing blood.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/10; A61M 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); A61J 1/12 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01); A61M 1/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61M 1/0236 (2013.01); A61J 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006079A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006079 A1 20000210; AU 5027099 A 20000221; BR 9912546 A 20010502; CA 2338604 A1 20000210; CN 1316895 A 20011010; EP 1100428 A1 20010523; HU 0103416 A2 20020228; HU 0103416 A3 20020429; ID 30222 A 20011115; JP 2002521138 A 20020716; NO 20010440 A 20010125; NO 20010440 D0 20010125; PL 345797 A1 20020102; TW 477696 B 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037955

2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-07-16 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-07-16 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20031106

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010228;LT PAYMENT 20010228;LV PAYMENT 20010228;MK PAYMENT 20010228;RO PAYMENT 20010228;SI PAYMENT 20010228