Global Patent Index - EP 1100510 A2

EP 1100510 A2 2001-05-23 - COMBINED PREPARATION OF ANTI-INFECTIOUSLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT THE 2-C-METHYLERYTHROSE-4 METABOLIC PATHWAY, AND INHIBITORS OF LIPID METABOLISM

Title (en)

COMBINED PREPARATION OF ANTI-INFECTIOUSLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT THE 2-C-METHYLERYTHROSE-4 METABOLIC PATHWAY, AND INHIBITORS OF LIPID METABOLISM

Title (de)

KOMBINATIONSPRÄPARAT VON ANTIINFEKTIÖS WIRKENDEN VERBINDUNGEN, DIE DEN 2-C-METHYLERYTHROSE-4-STOFFWECHSELWEG HEMMEN, UND HEMMERN DES FETTSTOFFWECHSELS

Title (fr)

PREPARATION COMBINEE DE COMPOSES A ACTION ANTI-INFECTIEUSE INHIBANT LA VOIE METABOLIQUE DE LA 2-C-METHYLERYTHROSE-4, ET INHIBITEURS DU METABOLISME LIPIDIQUE

Publication

EP 1100510 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99929309 A

Priority

  • DE 19828097 A
  • DE 19843279 A
  • EP 9904360 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966875A2] The invention relates to a combined preparation which, as an active ingredient, contains at least one anti-infectiously active compound that inhibits the 2-C-methylerythrose-4 metabolic pathway, and which contains at least one lipid metabolism inhibitor. The combined preparation is used in infectious processes, especially in infections in humans and animals and as a herbicide in plants. It is shown that the build-up of resistance against the inventive combined preparation is largely reduced compared to the build-up of resistance against the individual components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/66; A61K 45/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/365 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/445 (2006.01); C12N 9/88 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12Q 1/527 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/6893 (2013.01); C07K 14/445 (2013.01); C12N 9/88 (2013.01); C12N 15/52 (2013.01); C12Q 1/527 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966875A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966875 A2 19991229; WO 9966875 A3 20000914; AU 4615599 A 20000110; AU 752714 B2 20020926; CA 2334645 A1 19991229; CN 1348374 A 20020508; EP 1100510 A2 20010523; IL 139965 D0 20020210; JP 2002518418 A 20020625; PL 345513 A1 20011217; SK 19612000 A3 20010806; TR 200003783 T2 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASSAN, JOMAA

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOAGENCY AG

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASSAN, JOMAA

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010110;LV PAYMENT 20010110;MK PAYMENT 20010110;SI PAYMENT 20010110