Global Patent Index - EP 1100514 A2

EP 1100514 A2 2001-05-23 - INJECTABLE ANAESTHETIC CONTAINING NOBLE GAS

Title (en)

INJECTABLE ANAESTHETIC CONTAINING NOBLE GAS

Title (de)

EDELGASHALTIGE INJEKTIONSANÄSTHESIEMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENT ANESTHESIQUE INJECTABLE CONTENANT UN GAZ NOBLE

Publication

EP 1100514 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99939999 A

Priority

  • DE 19833014 A
  • EP 9904849 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833014A1] An injectable anesthetic composition comprises one or more gaseous lipophilic noble gases (I), or a gas mixture containing (I). Independent claims are included for: (1) the use of (I) (or gaseous mixtures containing (I)) for the preparation of an injectable anesthetic, sedative, analgesic, antinflammatory or muscle relaxant composition (2) apparatus for administration of a gaseous injectable anesthetic, sedative, analgesic, antinflammatory or muscle relaxant composition, comprising a gas dosing unit (preferably based on a piston pump), a control unit and a catheter linked to the dosing unit and (3) the use of a catheter for administration of a gaseous injectable anesthetic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 33/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 33/00 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004909A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833014 A1 20000127; AU 5410499 A 20000214; EP 1100514 A2 20010523; WO 0004909 A2 20000203; WO 0004909 A3 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IGELHORST, RALF

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NEU, PETER

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PILGER, CARSTEN

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHUCHT, FRIDTJOF

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI